Centis, Tajana Marie (CPSO#: 91196)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
960 Notre Dame Avenue- Unit C
Sudbury ON  P3E 2T4
Phone: (705) 560-1018
Fax: (705) 566-7617
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tajana Centis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 12 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Centis ( CPSO# 91196 )

Business Address:
Suite C
960 Notre Dame Avenue
Sudbury ON  P3A 2T4
Phone Number: (705) 560-1018

Business Address:
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TAJANA MARIE CENTIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CENTIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011