Chackungal, Smita (CPSO#: 86589)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Sep 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospita
395 Carrie Street
Strathroy ON  N7G 3J4
Phone: 519-245-5295 Ext. 5857
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

GREY BRUCE HEALTH SERVICES
P.O. BOX 1800
1800 8TH STREET EAST
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Canada
Phone: 519-376-2121 Ext. 2269
Fax: 519-372-3933
County: County of Grey
Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SMITA CHACKUNGAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHACKUNGAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Mar 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 31 Mar 2012 to 30 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 31 Mar 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 04 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 03 Aug 2016
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2013