Chahal, Jaskarndip Singh (CPSO#: 82778)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B1
Phone: 416-323-6318
Fax: 416-323-6314
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street - 1 East 447
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
Phone: (416) 603-5630
Fax: (416) 981-3308
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jaskarndip Chahal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 27 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Chahal ( CPSO# 82778 )

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
Suite 7334
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B1
Phone Number: (416) 603-5630

Business Address:
399 Bathurst Street
1 East 447
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5630

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JASKARNDIP SINGH CHAHAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAHAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010