Chahine, Danielle Anne (CPSO#: 90033)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Danielle Chahine Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 31 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: Quinte West Medical Center 80 Catherine Street Trenton ON K8V 6N8
Date Received: 29 Apr 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2015