Chaker, Ahmad Mohammad Ameen (CPSO#: 83846)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Baghdad, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Elite Cane Clinics
250 Tecumseh Rd E
Windsor ON  N8X 2R3
Phone: (519) 971-2901
Fax: (519) 971-2902
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2710 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3X5
Canada
Phone: (519) 915-2101
Fax: (519) 971-2902
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ahmad Chaker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chaker ( CPSO# 83846 )

Business Address:
3 - 130 Ouellette Place
Windsor ON  N8X 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 971-2901

Business Address:
Elite Care Clinics
250 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8X 2R3
Phone Number: (519) 971-2901

Business Address:
2710 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3X5
Phone Number: (519) 915-2101

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 May 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AHMAD MOHAMMAD AMEEN CHAKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAKER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2005
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Nov 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Nov 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Feb 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jul 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2008