Chakrabarty, Lina Sujata (CPSO#: 77700)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department Of Emergency Medicine
The Scarborough Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 438-2911 Ext. 8181
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lina S. Chakrabarty Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 26 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Chakrabarty ( CPSO# 77700 )

Business Address:
Department of Emergency Medicine
The Scarborough Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Business Address:
309 - 2065 Finch Avenue West
North York ON  M3N 2V7
Phone Number: (416) 507-6447

Business Address:
3030 Birchmount Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1P 3W3

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 20 Dec 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LINA SUJATA CHAKRABARTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAKRABARTY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2004