Chaloupka, Milan (CPSO#: 79753)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Nov 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Nov 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Czech, English, Slovak

Education:Charles Univ Prague, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 28 Jul 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 29 Jul 2003 to 28 Jul 2004
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 30 Aug 2005 to 29 Aug 2006
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 30 Aug 2006 to 30 Nov 2006
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jul 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Sep 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2006