Chamberlain, Clive Gordon (CPSO#: 18399)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 1962

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 12 Jul 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
208 St Clair Ave W
Toronto ON  M4V 1R2
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 33434
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

250 College St
Toronto ON  M5T1L8
Canada
Phone: 416 535 8501 Ext. 33434
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.G. Chamberlain Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 03 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Chamberlain ( CPSO# 18399 )

Business Address:
33 Russell Street
Toronto ON  M5S 2S1
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Business Address:
7th Floor
525 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8

Business Address:
208 St Clair Avenue West
Toronto ON  M4V 1R2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,- Russell Street Site Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 27 Nov 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1962
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 12 Jul 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 12 Jul 2011 Active View Details [+]
            As from July 12, 2011, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Clive Gordon
            Chamberlain, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr.
            Chamberlain to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Chamberlain may not engage in the practice of conducting third party
                  reports in forensic psychiatry or custody and access matters.