Chamberlain, Matthew Ryan (CPSO#: 90485)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 May 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 May 2016

Summary

Former Name: Chamberlain, Matthew (used until: 04 May 2016 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
K-W CardioPulmonary Services
430 The Boardwalk
Suite 206
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone: (519) 741-5252 Ext. 417
Fax: (519) 741-5772
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chamberlain & Park Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 11 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Chamberlain ( CPSO# 90485 )
Dr. D. Park ( CPSO# 90528 )

Business Address:
K-W CardioPulmonary Services
430 The Boardwalk
Suite 206
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone Number: (519) 741-5252

Business Address:
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 744-3311

Business Address:
St. Mary's General Hospital
Cardiac Rehabilitation Center
50 Bathurst Drive
Unit 1
Waterloo ON  N2V 2C5
Phone Number: (519) 885-9517

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 05 Nov 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATTHEW RYAN CHAMBERLAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAMBERLAIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 25 Sep 2013 to 19 Nov 2013
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Nov 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 2016