Chambers, Reid William (CPSO#: 95989)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jan 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jan 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
190 Melrose ave
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4K7
Phone: 6137985555 Ext. 19798
Fax: 6137614635
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Reid Chambers Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 05 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Chambers ( CPSO# 95989 )

Business Address:
190 Melrose Avenue
Box 213
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4X7
Phone Number: (613) 668-5532

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REID WILLIAM CHAMBERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAMBERS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2018