Chami, Rose Ali (CPSO#: 94627)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 2014

Expiry Date:  31 Jul 2021

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Aug 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Lebanese University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Pathology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-5430
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Lebanon

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 06 Dec 2010 to 18 Feb 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 19 Feb 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 15 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2014
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 31 Jul 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Aug 2014 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Rose Ali Chami may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Laboratory  Medicine  and  Pathobiology,  University of Toronto, in
                        which  Dr.  Chami  holds an academic appointment  at  the  rank  of
                        Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration  automatically  expires  seven years from
                  the  date  of  issuance  or when Dr. Chami  no longer holds the  academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration  automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee  renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating  that Dr. Chami's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional  conduct,  or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does  not  receive  an  annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about  Dr.  Chami's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued  on  August  1,  2014.  In accordance  with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will,  if  not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on July 31, 2021.