Chan, Arlene Sze Lun (CPSO#: 77911)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Nov 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough Sexual Health Clinic
160 Borough Drive
Toronto ON  M1P 4N8
Phone: 416-338-7438
Fax: (416) 338-6100
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Crossways Sexual Health Clinic
2340 Dundas St West
Toronto ON  M6P 4A9
Canada
Phone: (416) 392-0999
Fax: (416) 392-7102
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

1678 Bloor St West
Suite 301
Toronto ON  M6P 1A9
Canada
Phone: 416-975-9300
Fax: 416-975-0314
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Bay Centre for Birth Control
76 Grenville St, 3rd floor
Toronto, Ont
M5S 1B2
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Canada
Phone: (416) 351-3700
Fax: (416) 351-3727
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hassle Free Clinic
66 Gerrard St. East, 2nd floor
Toronto, Ont
Toronto ON  M5B 1G3
Canada
Phone: (416) 922-0566
Fax: (416) 922-2018
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARLENE SZE LUN CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 2004