Chan, Audrey Sze-ming (CPSO#: 81292)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Feb 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
King West Medical Associates
505 King Street West
Hamilton ON  L8P 1B9
Phone: (905) 525-3501
Fax: (905) 528-5468
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Milton District Hospital
Emergency Department
7030 Derry Road
Milton ON  L9T 7H6
Canada
Phone: (905) 876-7606
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AUDREY SZE-MING CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2007