Chan, Barry Tin Shin (CPSO#: 93485)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queens University
Department of Internal Medicine
Etherington Hall Room 1018
94 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone: (613) 533-2780
Fax: (613) 533-6654
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BARRY TIN SHIN CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014