Chan, Beverley Pui Kee (CPSO#: 86714)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jan 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oakville Vascular
2035 Cornwall Road
Oakville ON  L6J 7S2
Phone: 905-815-0999
Fax: 905-815-0997
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

237 Barton St. East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Canada
Phone: 905-521-2100
Fax: 289-816-1479
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton St. East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Canada
Phone: 905-521-2100
Fax: 289-816-1479
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Joseph Brant Hospital
1230 North Shore Blvd E
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Canada
Phone: 905-681-4881
Fax: 905-681-4879
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

St Catharines General Hospital
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Canada
Phone: 905-378-4647
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Beverley Chan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Chan ( CPSO# 86714 )

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-4322

Business Address:
2035 Cornwall Raod
Oakville ON  L6J 7S2
Phone Number: (905) 815-0999

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6

Business Address:
1230 North Shore Boulevard East
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7

Business Address:
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BEVERLEY PUI KEE CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 7 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Vascular Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2016