Chan Chun Kong, Ariane (CPSO#: 62692)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Dec 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
679 Davis Drive
Suite 309
Newmarket ON  L3Y 5G8
Phone: (905) 895-6636
Fax: (905) 895-6618
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

York Medical Centre
17215 Leslie Street
Newmarket ON
L3Y 8E4
Newmarket ON  L3Y 4V8
Canada
Phone: (905) 853-0404
Fax: (905)853 3702
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ariane Chan Chun Kong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chan Chun Kong ( CPSO# 62692 )

Business Address:
309 - 679 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 5G8
Phone Number: (905) 895-6636

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARIANE CHAN CHUN KONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN CHUN KONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 1991