Chan, Cynthia Jenifer (CPSO#: 88779)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Campus
Dept. of Obstetrics & Gynecology
PO BOX 5010 Suite B2-422
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8002
Fax: (519) 685-8071
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nelson Chan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 01 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Chan ( CPSO# 88779 )
Dr. N. Chan ( CPSO# 89080 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Family Medical Centre
346 Platts Lane
London ON  N6G 1J1
Phone Number: (519) 672-9660

Business Address:
24 Huron Street West
Exeter ON  N0M 1S2
Phone Number: (519) 235-2700


Corporation Name: Cynthia Chan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 01 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Chan ( CPSO# 88779 )
Dr. N. Chan ( CPSO# 89080 )

Business Address:
LHSC Victoria Campus
Department of Obstetrics and Gynecology
PO Box 5010 Suite B2-422
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8002

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CYNTHIA JENIFER CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013