Chan, Dora (CPSO#: 84240)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
205 - 600 Sherbourne Street
Toronto ON  M4X 1W4
Phone: (647) 350-2211
Fax: (647) 350-2213
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dora Chan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 09 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Chan ( CPSO# 84240 )

Business Address:
Suite 205
600 Sherbourne Street
Toronto ON  M4X 1W4
Phone Number: (647) 350-2211

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DORA CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2011