Chan, Gabriel (CPSO#: 85158)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 20 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Transplantation

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Transplantation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Aug 2010