Chan, Howard Ho Wai (CPSO#: 71846)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 May 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:Chinese University of Hong Kong, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1165 Creditstone Road
Concord ON  L4K4N7
Phone: 905-6690528
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Howard H.W. Chan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 8 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
Hong Kong S A R
United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 23 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HOWARD HO WAI CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Clinician Investigator

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Clinician Investigator

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Clinician Investigator

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 2002