Chan, John Chi Cheong (CPSO#: 73893)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 115
13311 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 3L6
Phone: (905) 773-2362
Fax: (905) 773-8499
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John Chi Cheong Chan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 10 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Chan ( CPSO# 73893 )

Business Address:
Suite 115
13311 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 3L6
Phone Number: (905) 773-2362

Business Address:
190 - 34 Berczy Street
Aurora ON  L4G 1W9
Phone Number: (905) 841-6611

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 27 Apr 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN CHI CHEONG CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Oct 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2005