Chan, Joseph Edmund (CPSO#: 85369)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
3251 Sheppard Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1T 3W5
Phone: (416) 546-7000
Fax: (416) 546-5500
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joseph E. Chan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 05 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Chan ( CPSO# 85369 )

Business Address:
Suite 202
3251 Sheppard Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1T 3W5
Phone Number: (416) 546-7000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH EDMUND CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Jul 2006 to 31 Aug 2006
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2009