Chan, Ka Lam (CPSO#: 88780)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southmount Healthcare Centre
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 3W2
Phone: (905) 662-3367
Fax: 905-592-2325
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Extendicare Hamilton,
90 Chedmac Drive
Hamilton ON  L9C 7W1
Canada
Phone: (905) 318-4472
Fax: (905) 318-1162
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ka Lam Chan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 29 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Chan ( CPSO# 88780 )

Business Address:
2B-35 Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 3W2
Phone Number: (905) 662-3367

Business Address:
90 Chedmac Drive
Hamilton ON  L8J 3W2
Phone Number: (905) 318-4472

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KA LAM CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2010