Chan, Nancy Gain (CPSO#: 76492)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Campus Site
Department of Pathology
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 4G5
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NANCY GAIN CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006