Chan, Nelson Nai Shun (CPSO#: 89080)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Care London
Family Medical Centre
P.O. Box 5777, Stn B
London ON  N6A4V2
Phone: (519) 672-9660
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

24 Huron St West
Exeter ON  N0M 1S3
Canada
County: County of Huron
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nelson Chan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 01 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Chan ( CPSO# 88779 )
Dr. N. Chan ( CPSO# 89080 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Family Medical Centre
346 Platts Lane
London ON  N6G 1J1
Phone Number: (519) 672-9660

Business Address:
24 Huron Street West
Exeter ON  N0M 1S2
Phone Number: (519) 235-2700


Corporation Name: Cynthia Chan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 01 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Chan ( CPSO# 88779 )
Dr. N. Chan ( CPSO# 89080 )

Business Address:
LHSC Victoria Campus
Department of Obstetrics and Gynecology
PO Box 5010 Suite B2-422
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8002

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
South Huron Hospital Exeter
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NELSON NAI SHUN CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010