Chan, Philip Chun-Wai (CPSO#: 76787)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Queensland, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Philip Chan Medicine Proefssional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 10 2010

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2010