Chan, Philip Shiu-Lung (CPSO#: 76205)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Mar 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Mar 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Healthcare Hamilton
Department of Anaesthesia
Room D149
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 33853
Fax: (905) 521-6019
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Philip SL Chan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Chan ( CPSO# 76205 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Department of Anaesthesia
50 Charlton Avenue East
Room D149
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Pain Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHILIP SHIU-LUNG CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2007