Chan, Raphael Li-Kuo (CPSO#: 78778)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jan 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jan 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital-General Campus
Palliative Care Program
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8940
Fax: (613) 739-6182
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Division of Palliative Care
University of Ottawa
43 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Canada
Phone: (613) 562-6262 Ext. 4008
Fax: (613) 562-6371
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chan Quach Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 07 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Quach ( CPSO# 78773 )
Dr. R. Chan ( CPSO# 78778 )

Business Address:
Division of Palliative Care
University of Ottawa
43 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Phone Number: (613) 562-6262

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
Palliative Care Program
501 Smyth Road
Room 5235
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8940

Business Address:
535 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0V1
Phone Number: (613) 746-5350

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAPHAEL LI-KUO CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2003 to 30 Sep 2004
Clinical Fellow - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2003