Chan, Raymond King Hei (CPSO#: 70909)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Nov 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 13 Jun 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 101
420 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3K2
Phone: (905) 709-0777
Fax: (905) 709-0776
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 18 Nov 1996 to 14 Dec 1996
Elective Trainee - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Dec 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 1997
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 13 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 07 Jul 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 07 Jul 2012 Active View Details [+]
            As from July 7, 2012, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Raymond King Hei
            Chan, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Chan to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Chan has relinquished his prescribing privileges with respect to the
                  following drugs, substances and preparations set out in the corresponding
                  regulations, as amended from time to time, and summarized as follows:
                  
                  
            Drug/Substance                      Relinquished       Not Relinquished

            Narcotic Drugs
            (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
             made under the Controlled Drugs
             and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19)    X

            Narcotic Preparations
            (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
             made under the Controlled Drugs
             and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19)    X

            Controlled Drugs
            (from Schedule G of the Regulations
             under the Food and Drugs
             Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27)                 X

            Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances
            (from the Benzodiazepines and Other 
            Targeted Substances Regulations made 
            under the Controlled Drugs and 
            Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19)        X

            Monitored Drugs                            
            (from the Ministry of Health and Long-Term
             Care List of Monitored Drugs,
             and as updated from time to time)         X