Chan, Simon (CPSO#: 95401)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jan 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jan 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
89 Holland Ave
Ottawa ON  K1Y 0Y1
Phone: (613) 729-1616
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Simon Chan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 09 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chan ( CPSO# 95401 )

Business Address:
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Business Address:
89 Holland Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 0Y1

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SIMON CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
Elective Trainee - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2014