Chan, Stephanie Chung Yan (CPSO#: 97585)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Clinique Ophtalmologique
de l'Outaouais
29 rue Ducharme
Gatineau QC  J8Y 3P7
Phone: (819) 771-6015
Fax: 819-484-0168

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHANIE CHUNG YAN CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 09 Mar 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 10 Mar 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018