Chande, Nilesh (CPSO#: 74974)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 667-6582
Fax: (519) 667-6820
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

101-750 Baseline Rd E.
London ON  N6C 2R5
Canada
Phone: 5196676582
Fax: 5196676820
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

310 Wellington Rd S.
London ON  N6C 4P4
Canada
Phone: 5194334700
Fax: 5194334702
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nilesh Chande Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 18 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Chande ( CPSO# 74974 )

Business Address:
101 - 750 Baseline Road East
London ON  N6C 2R5
Phone Number: (519) 667-6582

Business Address:
310 Wellington Road South
London ON  N6C 4P4
Phone Number: (519) 433-4700

Business Address:
LHSC Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 667-6582

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 26 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NILESH CHANDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANDE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004