Chandra, Niharika (CPSO#: 95578)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hindi

Education:McGill University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Room M-561
395 Carrie St
Strathroy ON  N7G 3J4
Phone: (519) 205-2000
Fax: (519) 205-2003
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Niharika Chandra Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 17 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Chandra ( CPSO# 95578 )

Business Address:
395 Carrie Street
M-561
Strathroy ON  N7G 3J4
Phone Number: (519) 245-5295

Business Address:
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Phone Number: (519) 631-2020

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NIHARIKA CHANDRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANDRA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016