Chandran, Lavan (CPSO#: 85086)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Harbourfront Medical
Suite 4
8 York Street
Toronto ON  M5J 2Y2
Phone: (416) 366-2273
Fax: (416) 366-5665
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Chandran & Gakhal Medicine Professional Corporporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 30 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Gakhal ( CPSO# 84308 )
Dr. L. Chandran ( CPSO# 85086 )

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
Room 1001
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6344

Business Address:
Harbourfront Health & Wellness Court
Suite 4
8 York Street
Toronto ON  M5J 2Y2
Phone Number: (416) 366-2273

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAVAN CHANDRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANDRAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2008