Chandran, Sujay Subash (CPSO#: 114036)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Oct 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Sep 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 27 Nov 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
David Braley Cardiac Vascular
and Stroke Research Institute
Suite C3-119
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-4322
Electoral District: 04

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUJAY SUBASH CHANDRAN may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. CHANDRAN is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. CHANDRAN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. CHANDRAN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. CHANDRAN shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. CHANDRAN ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. CHANDRAN ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Sep 2018.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 13 Oct 2017 to 26 Nov 2017
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 27 Nov 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Sep 2018
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Sep 2018