Chandrasena, Chandima (CPSO#: 74941)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Med. Fam. 535 Family Practice
535 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0V1
Phone: (613) 746-5350
Fax: (613) 746-5340
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHANDIMA CHANDRASENA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANDRASENA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2002