Chandrasena, Samantha Helen (CPSO#: 94061)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 May 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 May 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Medical University of the Americas, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
30 Chatham Street
Blenheim ON  N0P 1A0
Phone: (519) 676-5592
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

701 Oxford Street East
London ON  N5Y 3J8
Canada
Phone: 519-660-5199
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Samantha Chandrasena Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chandrasena ( CPSO# 94061 )

Business Address:
30 Chatham Street North
Blenheim ON  N0P 1A0
Phone Number: (519) 676-5592

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMANTHA HELEN CHANDRASENA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANDRASENA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Jul 2010
Elective Trainee - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 May 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 May 2014