Chandy, George Pariyampadathu (CPSO#: 77671)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
The Sleep Lab (F-195)
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 16067
Fax: (613) 761-5211
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E5J1
Canada
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sleep Disorders Centre
Health Sciences North
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Canada
Phone: (705)-523-7344
Fax: (705)-523-7284
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

Division of Respirology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

166 Brock Street,
Hotel Dieu Hospital
Kingston ON  K7L5G2
Canada
Phone: 613-548-2371
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: George Chandy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 10 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Chandy ( CPSO# 77671 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
East Block Basement
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Business Address:
700 Ross Avenue East
Sleep Lab
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Phone Number: (705) 267-2131

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 11 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEORGE PARIYAMPADATHU CHANDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANDY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006