Chang, Chih-Peng (CPSO#: 83901)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Mar 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Mar 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin, Taiwanese

Education:Taipei Medical College, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Boniface Park Medical Centre
700 Markham Rd., Unit 3A
Scarborough ON  M1H 2A7
Phone: (647) 350-6767
Fax: (647) 350-7679
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Terry Fox Medical Centre
5380 Terry Fox Way, #10
Mississauga ON  L5V 0A5
Canada
Phone: (905) 858-3030
Fax: (905) 858-3031
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.P. Chang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 18 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Chang ( CPSO# 83901 )

Business Address:
Suite 10
5380 Terry Fox Way
Mississauga ON  L5V 0A5
Phone Number: (905) 858-3030

Business Address:
Unit 3A
700 Markham Road
Scarborough ON  M1H 2A7
Phone Number: (647) 350-6767

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Taiwan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHIH-PENG CHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 02 Jan 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
International Specialist Physician - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Sep 2007
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 10 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Mar 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2008