Chang, Chiu Yen Michael (CPSO#: 77914)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Spanish

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Taunton Health Centre
1290 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone: (905) 721-4971
Fax: (905) 721-6696
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 24 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Chang ( CPSO# 77914 )

Business Address:
1290 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone Number: (905) 721-4971

Business Address:
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone Number: (905) 721-4971

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHIU YEN MICHAEL CHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007