Chang, Derrick (CPSO#: 72888)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
Fell Pavillion 1 503
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5405
Fax: (516) 603-5324
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Derrick Chang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 13 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Chang ( CPSO# 72888 )

Business Address:
399 Bathurst Street
Room 1-503
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5405

Business Address:
GS 480 - 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5C 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3856

Business Address:
101 - 50 Minthorn Boulevard
Markham ON  L3T 7X8
Phone Number: (905) 731-7232

Business Address:
5 - 1310 Don Mills Road
North York ON  M3B 2W6
Phone Number: (905) 855-1860

Business Address:
109 - 55 Town Centre Court
Scarborough ON  M1P 4X4
Phone Number: (905) 855-1860

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DERRICK CHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 06 Jul 1998 to 19 Aug 1998
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Aug 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1999