Chang, Edward Yong-Min (CPSO#: 68847)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
Department of Nuclear Medicine
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 973-4411 Ext. 33258
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Precision Diagnostic Imaging
2462 Howard Avenue, Unit 136
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Canada
Phone: 519-254-4555
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Erie Shores Healthcare
Hospital
194 Talbot St W
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Canada
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
Department of Nuclear Medicine
1995 Lens Ave
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Canada
Phone: 519-254-5577 Ext. 52374
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Edward Chang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Chang ( CPSO# 68847 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital - Ouellette Campus
Department of Nuclear Medicine
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4417

Business Address:
Leamington Hospital
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Phone Number: (519) 326-2373

Business Address:
Windsor Professional Centre
136 - 2462 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone Number: (519) 254-4555

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital - Met Campus
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDWARD YONG-MIN CHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nuclear Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999