Chang, Eugene Kichung (CPSO#: 95181)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Oct 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Oct 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Rehab Institute
550 University Avenue
Room 7-131-1
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Phone: (416) 597-3422 Ext. 4521
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Eugene K. Chang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 09 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Chang ( CPSO# 95181 )

Business Address:
Toronto Rehab Institute
Suite 7-131-1
550 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Phone Number: (416) 597-3422

Business Address:
610 University Avenue
2nd Floor
Toronto ON  M5T 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-4501

Business Address:
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 597-3422

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 08 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EUGENE KICHUNG CHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 06 Jun 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
Elective Trainee - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2012