Chang, Genevieve (CPSO#: 73349)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jul 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
23 Bolton Avenue
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2X3
Phone: (905) 895-8270
Fax: (905) 895-8227
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Genevieve Chang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 19 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Chang ( CPSO# 73349 )

Business Address:
23 Bolton Avenue
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2X3
Phone Number: (905) 895-8270

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 21 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GENEVIEVE CHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 10 May 1999 to 22 Jun 1999
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 May 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2000