Changela, Sheena Jayantilal (CPSO#: 102064)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Apr 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Apr 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 100
2025 Midland Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1P 3E2
Phone: 6477222370
Fax: 4163674301
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHEENA JAYANTILAL CHANGELA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANGELA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 23 Sep 2013 to 15 Dec 2013
Elective Trainee - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

University of Ottawa, 24 Feb 2014 to 09 Mar 2014
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Dec 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Mar 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 2018