Chao, Sonia Yueh-Sung (CPSO#: 74900)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Feb 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
15900 Bayview Avenue
Aurora ON  L4G 7Y3
Phone: (905) 726-9755
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Apr 2003 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 29 Nov 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SONIA YUEH-SUNG CHAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 09 Feb 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 10 Feb 2003 to 09 Feb 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2004