Chapman, Martin Giles (CPSO#: 71701)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Feb 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Feb 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Southampton, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Ctre
Dept of Critical Care Medicine
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 1708
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Martin Chapman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Chapman ( CPSO# 71701 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Ctre
Dept of Critical Care Medicine
Suite D108
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4522

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 18 Oct 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARTIN GILES CHAPMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAPMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 May 2001
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 May 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Feb 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2007