Charach, Nathaniel Abram (CPSO#: 95982)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre
Department of Psychiatry
30 the Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6000 Ext. 3680
Fax: 416-530-6076
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Charach Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 08 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Charach ( CPSO# 95982 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Healthcare
Department of Psychiatry
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 15 Jul 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATHANIEL ABRAM CHARACH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHARACH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 15 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2016