Charbonneau, Eric Yvon Joseph (CPSO#: 74799)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 04 Aug 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Aug 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Ottawa, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 7 - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2003
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Aug 2004