Charendoff, Jeffrey Stephen (CPSO#: 52760)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 28 May 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  November 16, 2017
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On December 11, 2017, Humber River Hospital notified the College that effective November 16, 2017, Dr. Jeffrey Charendoff has taken an approved leave of absence from his appointment as urologist during the course of an investigation by Humber River Hospital into Dr. Charendoff’s practice.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 16 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 May 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 28 May 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 28 May 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from May 28, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Jeffrey Stephen
            Charendoff, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr.
            Charendoff to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Charendoff has voluntarily and temporarily ceased to practise
                  medicine in all jurisdictions.